U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10249
  • Case Name: Tiffany L. Padilla
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Payment Advices]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Conversion to Chapter 7(Attorney use only)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Pisaturo, Charles A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.