U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10286
  • Case Name: Colonial Mills, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Extend Time]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Extend Time-Bankruptcy]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [BNC Service of Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Hearing Continued-Bankruptcy]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Evidentiary Hearing Set]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Update Objection/Response Deadline]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Interim Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Trustee Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Notice to the Court]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Proposed Order- Bankruptcy]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Memorandum of Law]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Approve (NOT for approving Loan Modifications through Court's Loss Mitigation Program)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Order, Notice of Deadlines and Date Set for 1188(a) Status Conference.]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Madoff, David B [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Add Judge (this is not Private Entry)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.