U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10298
  • Case Name: Joan M. Tonge
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.