U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10305
  • Case Name: Keith Patrick Studley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Service of Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Chapter 7 Form 122A-1 Statement of Your Monthly Income (means test)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Missing Document(s) Filed]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Corrective Action Taken (TEXT ONLY)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Order on Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Update Other Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [BNC Service of Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Generic Application]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Generic Application/Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Application to Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Payment Advices]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [(7) Day Order re: Missing Documents]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Certificate of Pro Se Debtor]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferrara, Stacy B. [Add Judge (this is not Private Entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.