U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Rhode Island

rhode island Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Rhode Island
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-10325
  • Case Name: Silvia M. Acuna
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Payment Advices]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [14 Day Order Re: Missing Documents]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Internet Credit Card Payment]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditor 7 individual]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Obtained prior to filing)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Statement of SSN (Form B121)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: DiOrio, Joseph M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.