open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-02634-jw
    Party Name:Frederick Darrow Katio
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Hearing Notice (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Modified Plan]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [TO - CII Order And Continued Confirmation Hearing (ADI)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Trustee Request For C-II Order Denying Confirmation and Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Relief from Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Calendar Removal Request]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certification of No Response and Request for 362 Default Order]
    Date Published:August 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [TO - CI Order And Continued Confirmation Hearing (ADI)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Trustee Request For C-I Order and Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Relief of Co-Debtor Stay]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:July 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Statement of Change]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:May 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Consent Allowing Payment of Funds to Creditor/Debtor Attorney - Non-Conduit]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Plan]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Stephenson, William K. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?289793
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =