open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03690-dd
    Party Name:Tawnya Nicole Sullivan
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:October 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Close Bankruptcy Case Auto]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case Auto]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:July 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice to Cure Credit Counseling Deficiency]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Pro Se Letter]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Filer Identification]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Correspondence]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290861
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =