open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-03689-dd
    Party Name:Deborah H White
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case (order)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Trustees Entry of Further Action]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:August 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Campbell, Kevin [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?290860
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =