open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04809-dd
    Party Name:Eliza Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:December 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Close Bankruptcy Case Auto]
    Date Published:December 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case Auto]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:October 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?292007
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =