open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04808-hb
    Party Name:Shirley Renee Gilbert
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service BNC Discharge/Closing]
    Date Published:January 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Close Bankruptcy Case Auto]
    Date Published:January 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Discharging Debtor 7/Trustee/Closing Case Auto]
    Date Published:January 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Avoid Lien (order)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Hearing Notice (Passive)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Avoid Lien on Household Goods 522(f)(1)(B)(i) (without passive hearing notice)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Application to Have the Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?292006
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =