open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04807-dd
    Party Name:Stefania Lynn Sumner
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Pay Wages To Trustee (order)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Trustees Proposed Order To Pay]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Deficiency Notice - Fee Due (Voluntary Petition)]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Simmons-Beasley, Pamela [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?292005
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =