open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:19-04806-hb
    Party Name:David Henry Suddarth and Christina Latoshia Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Amended Schedules/Statements]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Hearing Notice (Confirmation)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan - Modified Plan]
    Date Published:January 31, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:December 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [TO - CII Order (ADI)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Trustee Request For C-II Order Denying Confirmation]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Confirmation Hearing Held (batch)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?292004
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =