open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-00805-jw
    Party Name:Michael J. Sliker and Mary Clara Moyer-Sliker
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Schedules/Statements Filed]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [UST/Trustee Notice of Filings Due]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?294877
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =