open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-02280-hb
    Party Name:Elizabeth Sharon Hargrave
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Plan]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?296374
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =