open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-02723-jw
    Party Name:Yvonne Adassa Commodore
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice and Motion for Dismissal at Confirmation]
    Date Published:July 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Procedures for Loss Mitigation/Mortgage Modification (order)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Statement in Support of Confirmation]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Valuation Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Lien Avoidance Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan - Assume Included in Ch. 13 Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Plan]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Consent Allowing Payment of Funds to Creditor/Debtor Attorney - Non-Conduit]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wyman, James M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?296827
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =