open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-02721-dd
    Party Name:Melliony Nichole Carter
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:July 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:July 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:July 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:June 30, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?296825
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =