open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-03176-hb
    Party Name:Darrell Belvin Smith
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors by Telephone]
    Date Published:September 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Copies of Payment Advices]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Deficiency Notice - DeBN/Filer ID]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Clerks Clerical Action]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Deficiency Notice (General)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Fort, John K [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?297292
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =