open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina

SOUTH CAROLINA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of South Carolina
    Case Number:20-03175-dd
    Party Name:Jennifer Marie Johnson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Receipt of Filing Fee Via Internet]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Deficiency Notice - Fee Due (Voluntary Petition)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Notice Regarding Reset of Meeting of Creditors to Telephonic Meeting]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Service BNC Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Ch 7 Individual (No Asset) Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Debtor's Election Re: Electronic Noticing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (atty)]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Haigler, Janet B. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.scb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?297291
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =