U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00316-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Al Aqlan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Judgment CR]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2025: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Psychiatric Report Sealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.