U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00366-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cavey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Sentencing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 30, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - Not for objections to Presentence Reports]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum - Not for objections to Presentence Reports]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.