U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pigott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Certified Mail Receipt]
  • April 21, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 15, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 Sealed - Do not use for Appeal]
  • April 15, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order for Revocation Summons]
  • March 31, 2025: [Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.