U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00152-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Milligan et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment CR]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment CR]
  • April 28, 2025: [Sealed Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Depart from Guidelines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sealed Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 16, 2025: [Depart from Guidelines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.