U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:16-cr-00054-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 Sealed - Do not use for Appeal]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.