U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00503-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Raymond et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 17, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance]
  • April 03, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 03, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Rule 20 - Transfer In]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.