U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quanjae Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • April 14, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.