U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00538-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Figueroa et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Edwards Notice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Edwards Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 16, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [FRCrP 5 Disclosure Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standing Order Governing Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 Sealed - Do not use for Appeal]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.