U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-02132-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Detention]
  • April 10, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 10, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 Sealed - Do not use for Appeal]
  • April 10, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.