U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:17-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 25, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.