U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00537-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Kinney et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 29, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Edwards Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 28, 2025: [Suppress]
  • April 28, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 26, 2025: [Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance]
  • April 25, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice Of Intent to Use 404(b) Evidence]
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 25, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 25, 2025: [Edwards Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Bond ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2025: [FRCrP 5 Disclosure Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Standing Order Governing Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 Sealed - Do not use for Appeal]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brady Materials]
  • April 16, 2025: [Edwards Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.