U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01468-hb
  • Case Name: Kenneth Surbaugh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Show Cause Order w/pdf image]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Trustees Request for Rule to Show Cause for Failure to File Documents/Attend 341]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Voluntary Petition]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Notice of Filings Due PRO SE]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Notice to Cure Credit Counseling Deficiency]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Installment Payment Received]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Pay Filing Fees in Installment]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Pro Se Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Ch 13 Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Filer Identification]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Declaration Regarding Electronic Filing (Self-Represented Individual)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Bankruptcy Form 121 SSN]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Holland, Gretchen D. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.