U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00791-hb
  • Case Name: Cherita C Milligan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mathews, Annemarie Belanger [Certificate of Service BNC Document]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mathews, Annemarie Belanger [Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors - Pro Se]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mathews, Annemarie Belanger [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mathews, Annemarie Belanger [Show Cause Order w/pdf image]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mathews, Annemarie Belanger [Trustees Request for Rule to Show Cause for Failure to File Documents/Attend 341]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Mathews, Annemarie Belanger [Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors - Pro Se]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.