U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-03267
  • Case Name: Lee v. Vetpride Services, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 22, 2025: [Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: [Document Mailed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Proper Form Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.