U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-06024
  • Case Name: Strong v. Noojin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • May 01, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Compel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.