U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00587-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valkinburg
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 29, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure]
  • April 22, 2025: [Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [FRCrP 5 Disclosure Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 22, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 Sealed - Do not use for Appeal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 22, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.