U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Carolina

south carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00606-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ullah et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Notice]
  • April 29, 2025: [Case Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [FRCrP 5 Disclosure Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Entered]
  • April 23, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.