open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:14-cv-05010
    Party Name:Cheval International et al v. Smartpak Equine, LLC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Produce]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Acknowledgment of Service]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Form 52 Report]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:July 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Sent]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Form 52]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:April 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Motion Response]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Enforce]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Enforce]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54330
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 2 =