open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:16-cr-50126-1
    Party Name:USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type:Criminal [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Davis Claim - Motion to Reduce Sentence (filed in Civil Case)]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Transcript]
    Date Published:May 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [DEACTIVATED_Seal]
    Date Published:May 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re Transcript]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time re Transcript]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:[Search/Search & Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:August 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Document Unsealed]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joinder]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Document Sealed]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:June 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Declaration of Publication]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - DROPS]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:May 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Discovery]
    Date Published:April 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
    Date Published:April 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Ex Parte Docket Entry AND Document]
    Date Published:April 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Forfeiture]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:January 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony - Superseding]
    Date Published:November 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter(s) of Support]
    Date Published:November 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:March 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Amended]
    Date Published:March 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer of Garnishee]
    Date Published:February 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
    Date Published:January 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:December 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:November 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
    Date Published:August 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommended Special Conditions]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evaluation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Redaction Request]
    Date Published:June 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Public]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Restricted]
    Date Published:May 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:May 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Court Reporter Information]
    Date Published:May 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict (Redacted)]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Question]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Continuation]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Exclude]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Indictment / Superseding Indictment for Service]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Furlough]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Furlough]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Superseding]
    Date Published:February 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
    Date Published:November 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Returned]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Variance]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Departure]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Redacted Document]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Competency Report]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:August 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:March 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:March 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 09, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54301
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =