open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:11-cr-50074-1
    Party Name:USA v. Hastie
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:August 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:September 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Issued (EX PARTE)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48935
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =