open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:3:16-cr-30130-3
    Party Name:USA v. Bear Stops et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order of Detention]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
    Date Published:June 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
    Date Published:August 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:May 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Amended]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:February 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Furlough]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Bail Report]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Furlough]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:November 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Review Hearing]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Quash]
    Date Published:November 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:October 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:May 14, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?50295
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =