open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:12-cv-04075
    Party Name:Plucker v. United Fire & Casualty Company
  • Filing Type:Civil [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:April 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Redacted Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Verdict]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Continuation]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Question]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objections to Deposition Designations]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Designation of Deposition Testimony]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Jury List]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury List]
    Date Published:March 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Submissions]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?50478
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =