open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:1:13-cr-10007-1
    Party Name:USA v. Payne
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:July 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommended Special Conditions]
    Date Published:July 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:May 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent]
    Date Published:May 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:May 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:May 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:May 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:May 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application for Writ of Garnishment (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Default Judgment]
    Date Published:December 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Entry of Default]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Application]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Default]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52207
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =