open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:09-cr-40029-16
    Party Name:USA v. Villanueva-Godinez et al
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
    Date Published:October 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:May 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:November 10, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:September 23, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Early Termination of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?45781
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =