open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:15-cv-04087
    Party Name:Owen v. Young et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Preliminary Injunction]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Sent]
    Date Published:May 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53258
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =