open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:07-cv-04147
    Party Name:Sancom, Inc. v. Qwest Communications Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:March 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Sent]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Record Returned]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:December 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Court Reporter Information]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?42420
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =