open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:20-cr-50023-1
    Party Name:USA v. LeBeau
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Furlough]
    Date Published:June 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Furlough]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Enter Plea]
    Date Published:June 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:May 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:April 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:April 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unseal Case]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:September 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:August 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:April 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Termination of Supervision]
    Date Published:February 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Warrant]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Redaction Request]
    Date Published:September 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Return of Property]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Compel ]
    Date Published:July 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Release from Custody]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Property]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:June 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:March 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:December 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:October 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:September 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:September 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Public]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Restricted]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommended Special Conditions]
    Date Published:June 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:June 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
    Date Published:June 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Disclosure]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:May 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
    Date Published:May 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure ]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - DROPS]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Amended]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:March 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony - Superseding]
    Date Published:March 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:November 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Oral Motion]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Returned]
    Date Published:September 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Departure]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:May 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Superseding]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:February 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Transcript]
    Date Published:February 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Transport Defendant]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Recusal]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transport Defendant]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
    Date Published:December 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment - Amended]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Motion Response]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Produce]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
    Date Published:September 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Payment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Produce ]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Court Reporter Information]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict (Redacted)]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:August 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion in Limine]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Quash]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript of Voir Dire]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena Issued]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Subpoena(s)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recusal]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851(a)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Downward Departure]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Continuation]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Question]
    Date Published:July 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Quash]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Remand]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:June 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remand]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Recusal]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Joinder]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:[CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:December 06, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:May 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:May 29, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:May 12, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54150
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =