open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:12-cr-50014-1
    Party Name:USA v. Bissonette
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:October 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:May 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Jury List]
    Date Published:May 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Existing Document]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued on Revocation]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Warrant - Probation Request]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Warrant]
    Date Published:April 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment of Acquittal]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict (Redacted)]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Verdict]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Question]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Completed]
    Date Published:April 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Continuation]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury List]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Jury Trial - Began]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:March 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply]
    Date Published:March 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention - DROPS]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:September 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:September 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Exclude]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Early Termination]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Brief]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:May 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript - Redacted]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Motion]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:July 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:May 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?53062
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =