open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:13-cv-04062
    Party Name:Gard v. Kaemingk et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:June 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Opinion]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Received]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:September 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:August 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?52927
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =