open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:5:12-cr-50144-1
    Party Name:USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Invocation of Rights]
    Date Published:December 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Passport - Return of]
    Date Published:December 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommended Special Conditions]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:September 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:September 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:May 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:December 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Superseding]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:May 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Discovery]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:April 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:April 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Needed]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral Order]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:April 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Request]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Passport - Receipt of]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Arraignment]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Bail Report]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:February 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:January 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:December 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:December 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:July 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application / Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54703
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =