open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:09-cr-40136-1
    Party Name:USA v. Thomas
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:April 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment on Revocation]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Recommended Special Conditions]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informed Consent to Continuance]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
    Date Published:September 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:July 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Special Notice of Appearance - Supervising Attorney and Law Student]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:July 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:July 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing Error]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Existing Document]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:July 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Termination of Supervision]
    Date Published:January 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
    Date Published:January 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
    Date Published:February 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Presentence Report]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Allocution Statement]
    Date Published:November 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
    Date Published:September 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Draft Presentence Report]
    Date Published:September 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:September 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:[Complaint under Rule 5 - Out to Other Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pre-Sentence Payment]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest - Other District]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement (COURT USE ONLY)]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement Supplement]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Factual Basis]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:July 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
    Date Published:November 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54709
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =