open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

SOUTH DAKOTA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota
    Case Number:4:14-cv-04003
    Party Name:Dale v. Dooley et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Reopening Case]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:February 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt of Initial Partial Filing Fee]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:October 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
    Date Published:July 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Hearing]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:November 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend Deadlines]
    Date Published:September 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Reissued]
    Date Published:May 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return of Service Unexecuted]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
    Date Published:May 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:April 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:April 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extend]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Motion Response]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Material Facts]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:April 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case No Longer Referred]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Schedule]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Extend]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:May 09, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.sdd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?54091
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 2 =